THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9-B
211 Martindale Rd
St. Catharines ON L2S 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056462444
Fax: 9056469099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meshrki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Meshrki (CPSO#: 82055 )
Business Address: 9B-211 Martindale Rd
St Catharines ON L2S 3V7
(905) 646-2444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9-B
211 Martindale Rd
St. Catharines ON L2S 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056462444
Fax: 9056469099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meshrki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Meshrki (CPSO#: 82055 )
Business Address: 9B-211 Martindale Rd
St Catharines ON L2S 3V7
(905) 646-2444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAN SHAKER DAOUD MESHRKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHRKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAN SHAKER DAOUD MESHRKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHRKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2004