THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3 - 511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054507427
Fax: 9054502535
Address: Unit 10
17 Raylawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8
Phone: (905) 497-7475
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Mar 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waqar Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheema (CPSO#: 82070 )
Business Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6B 0B1
Business Address: Suite 3
511 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
(905) 450-7427
Business Address: Bsmt-55 Dundas St E
Toronto ON M5B 1C6
416-361-6000

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

Corporation Name: Doctors Aziz, Cheema, and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3 - 511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054507427
Fax: 9054502535
Address: Unit 10
17 Raylawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8
Phone: (905) 497-7475
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Mar 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waqar Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheema (CPSO#: 82070 )
Business Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6B 0B1
Business Address: Suite 3
511 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
(905) 450-7427
Business Address: Bsmt-55 Dundas St E
Toronto ON M5B 1C6
416-361-6000

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

Corporation Name: Doctors Aziz, Cheema, and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAQAR MUSTAFA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAQAR MUSTAFA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005