THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
3rd Floor
1290 Keith Ross Dr.
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6877
Fax: (905) 721-6686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Usha John Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. John (CPSO#: 82074 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
3rd Floor
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6877

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
3rd Floor
1290 Keith Ross Dr.
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6877
Fax: (905) 721-6686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Usha John Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. John (CPSO#: 82074 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
3rd Floor
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6877

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA SUSAN JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA SUSAN JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005