THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ruhuna, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 120
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-1314
Fax: (905) 693-8892

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyanthi Goonetillake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goonetillake (CPSO#: 82075 )
Business Address: Suite 120
330 Bronte Street
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-1314

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA
Medical School: University of Ruhuna, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 120
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-1314
Fax: (905) 693-8892

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyanthi Goonetillake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goonetillake (CPSO#: 82075 )
Business Address: Suite 120
330 Bronte Street
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-1314

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYANTHI GOONETILLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOONETILLAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYANTHI GOONETILLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOONETILLAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ruhuna, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2005