THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 180 Parsons Road
Suite 2
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 1E8
Phone: 7054350391
Fax: 7054352420
Address: 9080 Yonge Street, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289)597-7676
Fax: (289)597-7675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Keshoofy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Keshoofy (CPSO#: 82076 )
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent, PO Box 4000
Department of General Surgery
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Level 2
12-9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676
Business Address: P.O. Box 382
33 - 180 Parsons Road
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V6
(705) 435-0391

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 180 Parsons Road
Suite 2
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 1E8
Phone: 7054350391
Fax: 7054352420
Address: 9080 Yonge Street, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289)597-7676
Fax: (289)597-7675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Keshoofy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Keshoofy (CPSO#: 82076 )
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent, PO Box 4000
Department of General Surgery
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Level 2
12-9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676
Business Address: P.O. Box 382
33 - 180 Parsons Road
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V6
(705) 435-0391

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KESHOOFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHOOFY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KESHOOFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHOOFY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2005