THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 816-1849 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 487-3668
Fax: (416) 487-8886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre-Marc Legault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Legault (CPSO#: 82096 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St #816
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
416-487-3668
Business Address: 716 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 487-3668

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 816-1849 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 487-3668
Fax: (416) 487-8886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre-Marc Legault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Legault (CPSO#: 82096 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St #816
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
416-487-3668
Business Address: 716 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
(416) 487-3668

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE-MARC BOURGON LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE-MARC BOURGON LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2004