THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:32:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-6111
Fax: (519) 623-5300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel F. Cekan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cekan (CPSO#: 82106 )
Business Address: Unit 5
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
(519) 740-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-6111
Fax: (519) 623-5300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel F. Cekan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cekan (CPSO#: 82106 )
Business Address: Unit 5
246 Dundas Street South
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8A8
(519) 740-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL FRANKLIN CEKAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEKAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL FRANKLIN CEKAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEKAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2004