THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
1550-700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 360-6675
Fax: (705) 360-6676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Luc Ethier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ethier (CPSO#: 82153 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
1550-700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 360-6675
Fax: (705) 360-6676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Luc Ethier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ethier (CPSO#: 82153 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-LUC ETHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-LUC ETHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2005