THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fundación Universitaria Juan N. Corpas, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
1077 Golf Links Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-9895
Fax: (888) 355-3003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juan Sandoval Fonseca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sandoval Fonseca (CPSO#: 82154 )
Business Address: 1-1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
(807) 622-9895

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Fundación Universitaria Juan N. Corpas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
1077 Golf Links Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-9895
Fax: (888) 355-3003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juan Sandoval Fonseca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sandoval Fonseca (CPSO#: 82154 )
Business Address: 1-1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
(807) 622-9895

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN ALBERTO SANDOVAL FONSECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOVAL FONSECA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN ALBERTO SANDOVAL FONSECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOVAL FONSECA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Nov 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Nov 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: Fundación Universitaria Juan N. Corpas, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2005