THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9M 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-0600
Fax: (416) 745-0607
Address: 2-3480 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1H 1A9
Phone: 4162891200
Fax: 4162891201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucy Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Awad (CPSO#: 82174 )
Business Address: Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9M 2T8
(647) 774-8286

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9M 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-0600
Fax: (416) 745-0607
Address: 2-3480 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1H 1A9
Phone: 4162891200
Fax: 4162891201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucy Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Awad (CPSO#: 82174 )
Business Address: Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York Ontario M9M 2T8
(647) 774-8286

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
05 Oct 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 05 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., October 5, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
Dr. Lucy Awad:

At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-
facilitated instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the
date of this Order.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., October 5, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
Dr. Lucy Awad:

At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-
facilitated instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the
date of this Order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Oct 2012
Summary of Decision:
On October 5, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lucy Awad committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Awad admitted the allegation.

Dr. Awad is a family physician. She was born in Egypt and received her medical degree in Egypt in December 1992. Dr. Awad came to Canada in April 1996. With two exceptions, between April 1996 and October 2003, Dr. Awad did not practice medicine. The exceptions were that she:

(a) worked on a part time basis between December 1996 and May 1997 at the American
Hospital in Tanta, Egypt; and
(b) completed two months of training in the Psychiatric Department of the Ain Shams
University Hospital between December 2002 and February 2003.

Dr. Awad applied for registration/ membership to the following licensing/professional bodies:
Newfoundland Medical Board in July 2003.
College of Family Physicians of Canada in October 2003.
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in December 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba in January 2006.

 
Dr. Awad provided inaccurate information to these licensing/professional bodies regarding her practice history. On the basis of the above four applications, which included inaccurate information, Dr. Awad obtained her respective certificates of registration/ memberships.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's
certificate of registration:
(i) At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-facilitated
instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of this Order.

Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

Dr. Awad pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from
the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 5, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Oct 2012
Summary of Decision:
On October 5, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lucy Awad committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Awad admitted the allegation.

Dr. Awad is a family physician. She was born in Egypt and received her medical degree in Egypt in December 1992. Dr. Awad came to Canada in April 1996. With two exceptions, between April 1996 and October 2003, Dr. Awad did not practice medicine. The exceptions were that she:

(a) worked on a part time basis between December 1996 and May 1997 at the American
Hospital in Tanta, Egypt; and
(b) completed two months of training in the Psychiatric Department of the Ain Shams
University Hospital between December 2002 and February 2003.

Dr. Awad applied for registration/ membership to the following licensing/professional bodies:
Newfoundland Medical Board in July 2003.
College of Family Physicians of Canada in October 2003.
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in December 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba in January 2006.

 
Dr. Awad provided inaccurate information to these licensing/professional bodies regarding her practice history. On the basis of the above four applications, which included inaccurate information, Dr. Awad obtained her respective certificates of registration/ memberships.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's
certificate of registration:
(i) At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-facilitated
instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of this Order.

Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

Dr. Awad pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from
the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 5, 2012

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2005