THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Greenlane East, unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petra Oprea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oprea (CPSO#: 82200 )
Business Address: 181 Greenlane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Greenlane East, unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petra Oprea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oprea (CPSO#: 82200 )
Business Address: 181 Greenlane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243
Business Address: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETRA OPREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPREA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETRA OPREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPREA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005