THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:36:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3300 Rutherford Road
UNIT B6
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0307
Fax: 905-303-0207
Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
SUIT 201
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H1
Phone: 9053030307
Fax: 905-303-0207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMIR R.G. ASSAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Assad (CPSO#: 82212 )

Corporation Name: Samir R.G. Assad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3300 Rutherford Road
UNIT B6
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0307
Fax: 905-303-0207
Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
SUIT 201
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H1
Phone: 9053030307
Fax: 905-303-0207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMIR R.G. ASSAD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Assad (CPSO#: 82212 )

Corporation Name: Samir R.G. Assad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
26 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 12, 2022, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis Assad, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Assad has provided to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. SAMIR ROSHDY GIRGIS ASSAD
(“Dr. Assad”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Assad, certificate of registration number 82212, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking to the College on August 15, 2012 (my “2012 Undertaking”) in conjunction with two investigations into whether I engaged in professional misconduct. My 2012 Undertaking required me, among other things, to have a practice monitor approved by the College for all professional encounters with female patients. On November 17, 2021, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College referred allegations against me to the Discipline Tribunal, including in relation to breach of my 2012 Undertaking. I acknowledge that it is in the public interest that my 2012 Undertaking be replaced by a new Undertaking that requires me to have a practice monitor approved by the College who is a regulated health professional, for all professional encounters with patients.
(4) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, this Undertaking will replace my 2012 Undertaking.
B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective December 12, 2022.
(6) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall not perform massage therapy.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise (“Professional Encounter” or “Professional Encounters”), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice Monitor” or “Practice Monitors”), and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.
(c) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Practice Monitor.
(d) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A,” and understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
1. providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis;
2. remaining present at all times during all Professional Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients;
3. carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor’s view of all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;
4. refraining from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking attached as Appendix “A”, while observing me in all my Professional Encounters with patients;
5. maintaining a contemporaneous log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix “B” (the “Log”) and in the manner described in Appendix “A;
6. initialing all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log;
7. submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
8. remaining free of any conflict of interest with me.
(e) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to make it available to the College upon request.
(7) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(8) Posting a Sign
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “C” that states: Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “C.”
(c) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
(9) Notifying Patients
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in section (6)(a), above.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(10) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(11) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(12) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(13) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(14) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(15) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(16) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, while this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Assad shall not perform massage therapy.

Dr. Assad must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Assad’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Assad shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT
(17) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(18) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “D”.
(19) I, Dr. Assad, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and to the inspection of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(20) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Practice Monitors:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(21) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A”;
(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.
(22) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 12, 2022, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis Assad, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Assad has provided to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. SAMIR ROSHDY GIRGIS ASSAD
(“Dr. Assad”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Assad, certificate of registration number 82212, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking to the College on August 15, 2012 (my “2012 Undertaking”) in conjunction with two investigations into whether I engaged in professional misconduct. My 2012 Undertaking required me, among other things, to have a practice monitor approved by the College for all professional encounters with female patients. On November 17, 2021, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College referred allegations against me to the Discipline Tribunal, including in relation to breach of my 2012 Undertaking. I acknowledge that it is in the public interest that my 2012 Undertaking be replaced by a new Undertaking that requires me to have a practice monitor approved by the College who is a regulated health professional, for all professional encounters with patients.
(4) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, this Undertaking will replace my 2012 Undertaking.
B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective December 12, 2022.
(6) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall not perform massage therapy.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise (“Professional Encounter” or “Professional Encounters”), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice Monitor” or “Practice Monitors”), and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.
(c) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Practice Monitor.
(d) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A,” and understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
1. providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis;
2. remaining present at all times during all Professional Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients;
3. carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor’s view of all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;
4. refraining from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking attached as Appendix “A”, while observing me in all my Professional Encounters with patients;
5. maintaining a contemporaneous log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix “B” (the “Log”) and in the manner described in Appendix “A;
6. initialing all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log;
7. submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
8. remaining free of any conflict of interest with me.
(e) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to make it available to the College upon request.
(7) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(8) Posting a Sign
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “C” that states: Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “C.”
(c) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Assad, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
(9) Notifying Patients
(a) I, Dr. Assad, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in section (6)(a), above.
C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(10) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(11) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(12) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(13) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(14) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(15) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(16) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, while this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Assad shall not perform massage therapy.

Dr. Assad must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Assad’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Assad shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT
(17) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(18) I, Dr. Assad, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “D”.
(19) I, Dr. Assad, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and to the inspection of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(20) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Practice Monitors:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(21) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A”;
(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.
(22) I, Dr. Assad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Dec 2022
Summary of Decision:
On December 13, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Assad failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration in relation to his:
  • failure to comply with an undertaking;
  • deficiencies in record-keeping;
  • ordering and administering of unnecessary tests and treatments;
  • improper billing submissions to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP); and
  • unprofessional treatment of Patient A.
The Tribunal ordered that:
  • Dr. Assad attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. Assad’s certificate of registration for four months commencing immediately;
  • the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Assad’s certificate of registration;
  • Dr. Assad pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 13, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Agreed and Uncontested Facts and Plea, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-12-13

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis Assad to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 12, 2022:
 
Dr. Assad shall not perform massage therapy.

Dr. Assad must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Assad’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Assad shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Dec 2022
Summary of Decision:
On December 13, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Assad failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration in relation to his:
  • failure to comply with an undertaking;
  • deficiencies in record-keeping;
  • ordering and administering of unnecessary tests and treatments;
  • improper billing submissions to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP); and
  • unprofessional treatment of Patient A.
The Tribunal ordered that:
  • Dr. Assad attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. Assad’s certificate of registration for four months commencing immediately;
  • the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Assad’s certificate of registration;
  • Dr. Assad pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 13, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Agreed and Uncontested Facts and Plea, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-12-13

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Samir Roshdy Girgis Assad to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 12, 2022:
 
Dr. Assad shall not perform massage therapy.

Dr. Assad must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Assad’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Assad shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Assad must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Assad must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
 

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 26 Feb 2025
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 13 Apr 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 13 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 13 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2005