THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6960
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C V Srinivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Srinivas (CPSO#: 82216 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
4164641319

Corporation Name: C.V. Srinivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6960
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C V Srinivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Srinivas (CPSO#: 82216 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
4164641319

Corporation Name: C.V. Srinivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COIMBATORE VASUDEVAMOORTHY SRINIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COIMBATORE VASUDEVAMOORTHY SRINIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005