THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1502
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3600
Extension: 33554
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WOHC Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33555
Fax: (416) 747-3408

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehri Habibi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Habibi (CPSO#: 82222 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1502
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3600
Extension: 33554
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WOHC Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33555
Fax: (416) 747-3408

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehri Habibi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Habibi (CPSO#: 82222 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRI HABIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRI HABIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005