THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:51:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Lynd Ave
Toronto Ontario M6R 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 779-0807
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain medical records should contact Glengarry Memorial Hospital at:
Tel: (613) 525-2222 or send an email requesting their chart to [email protected].
Date Received: 26 Oct 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmin M. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Harrison (CPSO#: 82249 )
Business Address: 6 Lynd Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 1T7
(416) 779-0807

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Lynd Ave
Toronto Ontario M6R 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 779-0807
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain medical records should contact Glengarry Memorial Hospital at:
Tel: (613) 525-2222 or send an email requesting their chart to [email protected].
Date Received: 26 Oct 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmin M. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Harrison (CPSO#: 82249 )
Business Address: 6 Lynd Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 1T7
(416) 779-0807

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN MICHAEL HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN MICHAEL HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2005