THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 08:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: (905) 864-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherif Tawadross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tawadross (CPSO#: 82258 )
Business Address: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
(905) 569-8157

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: (905) 864-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherif Tawadross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tawadross (CPSO#: 82258 )
Business Address: Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
(905) 569-8157

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF MONGUI SADEK TAWADROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWADROSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF MONGUI SADEK TAWADROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWADROSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2005