THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kamel, Rabih (Used Until: 30 Oct 2005)
Medical School: University of Mosul, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
4646 Heritage Hills Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 232-4232
Fax: (905) 232-1110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Sarsam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sarsam (CPSO#: 82261 )
Business Address: Suite 12
4646 Heritage Hills Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 1Y4
(905) 232-4232

General Information

Former Name: Kamel, Rabih (Used Until: 30 Oct 2005)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Mosul, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
4646 Heritage Hills Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 232-4232
Fax: (905) 232-1110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Sarsam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sarsam (CPSO#: 82261 )
Business Address: Suite 12
4646 Heritage Hills Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 1Y4
(905) 232-4232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABIH SARSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABIH SARSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mosul, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2005