THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen (CPSO#: 82282 )
Business Address: 302 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 721-4422
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Cardio Respiratory Unit
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(613) 513-8579

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen (CPSO#: 82282 )
Business Address: 302 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 721-4422
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Cardio Respiratory Unit
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(613) 513-8579

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIN-YEE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIN-YEE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2005