THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Vukovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vukovic (CPSO#: 82353 )
Business Address: The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301
Business Address: 3 Northbrook Rd
East York ON M4J 4E9
4164647313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Vukovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vukovic (CPSO#: 82353 )
Business Address: The Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301
Business Address: 3 Northbrook Rd
East York ON M4J 4E9
4164647313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILORAD VUKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILORAD VUKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2005