THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:27:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10063 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-0090
Fax: (905) 508-0023
Address: Suite 205
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 895-0030
Fax: (905) 853-0052
Address: 130 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N1
Phone: 905-895-0030
Fax: 905-853-0052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikhail (CPSO#: 82379 )
Business Address: 10063 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T7
(905) 508-0090
Business Address: 16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 895-0030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10063 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-0090
Fax: (905) 508-0023
Address: Suite 205
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 895-0030
Fax: (905) 853-0052
Address: 130 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N1
Phone: 905-895-0030
Fax: 905-853-0052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikhail (CPSO#: 82379 )
Business Address: 10063 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T7
(905) 508-0090
Business Address: 16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 205
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 895-0030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF SHAFIK MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF SHAFIK MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2005