THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Heritage Park Medical Centre
200 Lorraine Ave., Unit 8
Kitchener Ontario N2B 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7457521
Fax: 5197457524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noumaan Ahmed Khawaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khawaja (CPSO#: 82380 )
Business Address: Suite 8
200 Lorraine Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2B 3R3
(519) 745-7521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Heritage Park Medical Centre
200 Lorraine Ave., Unit 8
Kitchener Ontario N2B 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7457521
Fax: 5197457524

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noumaan Ahmed Khawaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khawaja (CPSO#: 82380 )
Business Address: Suite 8
200 Lorraine Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2B 3R3
(519) 745-7521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOUMAAN AHMED KHAWAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOUMAAN AHMED KHAWAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2005