THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44575
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Address: 305-304 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Phone: 905-308-8346
Fax: 888-365-1147
Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Phone: 905-984-6402
Fax: 905-228-0822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A Harlock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harlock (CPSO#: 82407 )
Business Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 305 - 304 Victoria Avenue N.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
3C
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44575
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Address: 305-304 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Phone: 905-308-8346
Fax: 888-365-1147
Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Phone: 905-984-6402
Fax: 905-228-0822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A Harlock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harlock (CPSO#: 82407 )
Business Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 305 - 304 Victoria Avenue N.
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
3C
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY HARLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY HARLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005