THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:16:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 220-5913

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Oey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oey (CPSO#: 82419 )
Business Address: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
(519) 653-3321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 220-5913

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Oey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oey (CPSO#: 82419 )
Business Address: Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3N2
(519) 653-3321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY IE LAN OEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY IE LAN OEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005