THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-8333
Fax: (905) 373-9333
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Dr
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Pepper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pepper (CPSO#: 82421 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 5
1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 373-8333
Fax: (905) 373-9333
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Dr
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Pepper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pepper (CPSO#: 82421 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN RACHEL PEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN RACHEL PEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005