THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alisha Priesnitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Priesnitz (CPSO#: 82422 )
Business Address: Maple Clinic
D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
(613) 546-9721

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alisha Priesnitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Priesnitz (CPSO#: 82422 )
Business Address: Maple Clinic
D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H2
(613) 546-9721

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA ANN PRIESNITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIESNITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA ANN PRIESNITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIESNITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005