THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Health Care
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 285 3666
Extension: 4116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verduyn (CPSO#: 82425 )
Business Address: Providence Health Care
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666 Extn: 4116

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Health Care
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 285 3666
Extension: 4116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verduyn (CPSO#: 82425 )
Business Address: Providence Health Care
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666 Extn: 4116

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY MARGARET VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY MARGARET VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005