THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 515 Dundas Street West, Unit 12
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-901-5558
Fax: 905-901-5588

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Zhang (CPSO#: 82427 )
Business Address: 12 - 515 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 4M2
(905) 901-5558

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 515 Dundas Street West, Unit 12
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-901-5558
Fax: 905-901-5588

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Zhang (CPSO#: 82427 )
Business Address: 12 - 515 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 4M2
(905) 901-5558

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005