THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
89 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 265-7477
Fax: (519) 265-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Strode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Strode (CPSO#: 82429 )
Business Address: 208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
89 Dawson Rd
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 265-7477
Fax: (519) 265-6006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Strode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Strode (CPSO#: 82429 )
Business Address: 208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY KATHERINE STRODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRODE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY KATHERINE STRODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRODE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005