THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:53:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Room L424
Microbiology, Virology Lab
Laboratory Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36143
Fax: 905-521-6083
Address: 711 Concession St
Juravinski hospital
Room A3-79
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36143
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga, Ontario
L5T 2X4
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 905-565-0433
Extension: 32310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
LifeLabs Medical Laboratories
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 4166754530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Leto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leto (CPSO#: 82433 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Charlton Campus
Room L424
Microbiology/Virology Lab
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
905-522-1155 Extn: 36143
Business Address: Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga Ontario L5T 2X4
(905) 565-0433 Extn: 32310
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Medicine - Room A3-70
711 Concession Street
Toronto Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43251

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Room L424
Microbiology, Virology Lab
Laboratory Medicine
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36143
Fax: 905-521-6083
Address: 711 Concession St
Juravinski hospital
Room A3-79
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 36143
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga, Ontario
L5T 2X4
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 905-565-0433
Extension: 32310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Boulevard
LifeLabs Medical Laboratories
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 4166754530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Leto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leto (CPSO#: 82433 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Charlton Campus
Room L424
Microbiology/Virology Lab
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
905-522-1155 Extn: 36143
Business Address: Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga Ontario L5T 2X4
(905) 565-0433 Extn: 32310
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Medicine - Room A3-70
711 Concession Street
Toronto Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA LAURA LETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELA LAURA LETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005