THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 7228086
Fax: (613) 761-1944
Address: Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 850 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M3
Phone: 6133616363
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 747 Silver Seven Road
Unit 36
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: (613) 714-4666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghosh (CPSO#: 82444 )
Business Address: 201 - 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 722-8086
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7000
Business Address: Carleton Place
211 Lake Ave. E.
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 7228086
Fax: (613) 761-1944
Address: Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 850 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M3
Phone: 6133616363
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 747 Silver Seven Road
Unit 36
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: (613) 714-4666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghosh (CPSO#: 82444 )
Business Address: 201 - 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 722-8086
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7000
Business Address: Carleton Place
211 Lake Ave. E.
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINA GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINA GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005