THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:21:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5P 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
Chester Village
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
Phone: 4164662173
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Belmont St.
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
Phone: (416) 964-9231
Extension: 214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathew (CPSO#: 82454 )
Business Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
4 units
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
(416) 466-2173
Business Address: Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St. Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5P 3N3
(416) 928-9343
Business Address: 55 Belmont Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
(416) 964-9231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5P 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
Chester Village
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
Phone: 4164662173
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Belmont St.
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
Phone: (416) 964-9231
Extension: 214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathew (CPSO#: 82454 )
Business Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
4 units
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
(416) 466-2173
Business Address: Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St. Clair West
Toronto Ontario M5P 3N3
(416) 928-9343
Business Address: 55 Belmont Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 1R1
(416) 964-9231

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVY MARY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVY MARY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005