THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
RFE - GS - 480
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 23 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 82458 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
ER Department
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 468-6435
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856 Extn: 5
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
RFE - GS - 480
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 23 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng (CPSO#: 82458 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
ER Department
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 468-6435
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856 Extn: 5
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005