THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roop Kaur Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 82463 )
Business Address: 203 - 480 Huronia Road
Simcoe Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 727-7688

Corporation Name: Dr. Roop Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roop Kaur Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 82463 )
Business Address: 203 - 480 Huronia Road
Simcoe Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 727-7688

Corporation Name: Dr. Roop Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOP KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROOP KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005