THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:27:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory
Ontario
P0L1W0
Moose Factory Ontario P0L1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076584544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Room 1464D
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kirlew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirlew (CPSO#: 82492 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory
Ontario
P0L1W0
Moose Factory Ontario P0L1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076584544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Room 1464D
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kirlew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirlew (CPSO#: 82492 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LIVINGSTONE KIRLEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRLEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LIVINGSTONE KIRLEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRLEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005