THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:15:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. AJ Mercado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mercado (CPSO#: 82497 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 613-2030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. AJ Mercado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mercado (CPSO#: 82497 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 613-2030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Suspension Imposed by OPSDT Discipline Tribunal Effective February 9, 2024
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Suspension Imposed by OPSDT Discipline Tribunal Effective February 9, 2024

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Feb 2024
Summary of Decision:

On February 8, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Mercado engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately, and without consent or authorization, accessing the health records of approximately 20 individuals who were not under his care, including but not limited to family members, colleagues and others.

The Tribunal ordered that:  

  1. Dr. Mercado attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Mercado’s certificate of registration for four (4) months commencing February 9, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Mercado pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 11, 2024.

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected] 

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits; Penalty; Reprimand: February 8, 2024

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Feb 2024
Summary of Decision:

On February 8, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Mercado engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately, and without consent or authorization, accessing the health records of approximately 20 individuals who were not under his care, including but not limited to family members, colleagues and others.

The Tribunal ordered that:  

  1. Dr. Mercado attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Mercado’s certificate of registration for four (4) months commencing February 9, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Mercado pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 11, 2024.

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected] 

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits; Penalty; Reprimand: February 8, 2024

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 09 Jun 2024
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 09 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005