THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3100 Brock Street North
Suite 7
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 665-3100
Fax: (905) 665-3120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rubabaza (CPSO#: 82500 )

Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SWAHILI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3100 Brock Street North
Suite 7
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 665-3100
Fax: (905) 665-3120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rubabaza (CPSO#: 82500 )

Corporation Name: Eltayeb and Rubabaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PLACIDE A RUBABAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBABAZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PLACIDE A RUBABAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBABAZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005