THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Extension: 25395
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alain Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haddad (CPSO#: 82508 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 25395
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 25395

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7700
Extension: 25395
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alain Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haddad (CPSO#: 82508 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 25395
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 25395

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAIN HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAIN HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005