THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Alma Street
Rockwood Ontario N0B 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-856-4611
Fax: (519) 856-4612

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please see notes for practice closure in Dec 2022. For this address: Suite 205, 531 Davis Drive, Newmarket, Regional Municipality of York, the medical records are stored at:

RSRS: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.

1‐888‐ 563‐3732, Ext. 1

Date Received: 04 Jul 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghorayeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghorayeb (CPSO#: 82510 )
Business Address: 175 Alma Street
Rockwood Ontario N0B 2K0
519-856-4611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Alma Street
Rockwood Ontario N0B 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-856-4611
Fax: (519) 856-4612

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please see notes for practice closure in Dec 2022. For this address: Suite 205, 531 Davis Drive, Newmarket, Regional Municipality of York, the medical records are stored at:

RSRS: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.

1‐888‐ 563‐3732, Ext. 1

Date Received: 04 Jul 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghorayeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghorayeb (CPSO#: 82510 )
Business Address: 175 Alma Street
Rockwood Ontario N0B 2K0
519-856-4611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR HANNA GHORAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHORAYEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAR HANNA GHORAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHORAYEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005