THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Extension: 32128
Fax: (519) 767-3536

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Patrick (CPSO#: 82519 )
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Extension: 32128
Fax: (519) 767-3536

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Patrick (CPSO#: 82519 )
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
Addiction Division
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON PATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON PATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005