THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:47:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint CMHC
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1182 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Van Impe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Impe (CPSO#: 82520 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint CMHC
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1182 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Van Impe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Impe (CPSO#: 82520 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOHN HOWARD VAN IMPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN IMPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOHN HOWARD VAN IMPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN IMPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005