THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:02:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 506-0804
Extension: 2328
Fax: (416) 217-3952
Address: True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaajal Abrol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abrol (CPSO#: 82531 )
Business Address: True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
(905) 707-1777
Business Address: 1101 - 655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
(416) 506-0804 Extn: 2328

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 506-0804
Extension: 2328
Fax: (416) 217-3952
Address: True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaajal Abrol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abrol (CPSO#: 82531 )
Business Address: True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y7
(905) 707-1777
Business Address: 1101 - 655 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2K4
(416) 506-0804 Extn: 2328

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAAJAL ABROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABROL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAAJAL ABROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABROL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005