THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 08:20:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: (416) 221-8784

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lim and Hew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lim (CPSO#: 79437 ) Dr. S. Hew (CPSO#: 82532 )
Business Address: Division of Neurology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 2461
Business Address: 304 - 4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 221-8612

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: (416) 221-8784

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lim and Hew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lim (CPSO#: 79437 ) Dr. S. Hew (CPSO#: 82532 )
Business Address: Division of Neurology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 2461
Business Address: 304 - 4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 221-8612

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA LEW-CHENG HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA LEW-CHENG HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005