THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:54:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Bloor Street East
Lume Women + Health
Suite 1200, South Tower
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-1510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARAH NAOMI SHAW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaw (CPSO#: 82541 )
Business Address: 1200-175 Bloor Street East
Lume Women + Health
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
416-646-1510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Bloor Street East
Lume Women + Health
Suite 1200, South Tower
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-1510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARAH NAOMI SHAW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaw (CPSO#: 82541 )
Business Address: 1200-175 Bloor Street East
Lume Women + Health
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
416-646-1510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH NAOMI SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH NAOMI SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005