THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:55:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64706
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Noah Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenspoon (CPSO#: 82546 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
3rd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9711 Extn: 64706

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64706
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Noah Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenspoon (CPSO#: 82546 )
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
3rd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9711 Extn: 64706

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY NOAH GREENSPOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPOON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY NOAH GREENSPOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPOON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005