THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbora Marie Pek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pek (CPSO#: 82553 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: 414 Victoria Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
(905) 529-5221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbora Marie Pek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pek (CPSO#: 82553 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: 414 Victoria Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
(905) 529-5221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBORA MARIE PEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBORA MARIE PEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005