THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:26:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 335-6142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angeli Vohra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vohra (CPSO#: 82556 )
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1142

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 335-6142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angeli Vohra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vohra (CPSO#: 82556 )
Business Address: 101-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1142

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELI VOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELI VOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005