THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:03:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4555 Hurontario St
Marketplace Medical
Unit C7
Mississauga ON L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055074300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karna Kale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kale (CPSO#: 82562 )
Business Address: Marketplace Medical
C7 - 4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
(905) 507-4700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, URDU
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4555 Hurontario St
Marketplace Medical
Unit C7
Mississauga ON L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055074300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karna Kale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kale (CPSO#: 82562 )
Business Address: Marketplace Medical
C7 - 4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1
(905) 507-4700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARNA CHANDARRAO KALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARNA CHANDARRAO KALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005