THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:37:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadek (CPSO#: 82575 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5L1
Business Address: Box 703
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8135
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-5000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadek (CPSO#: 82575 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5L1
Business Address: Box 703
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8135
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 761-5000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUHANNAD M SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUHANNAD M SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005