THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite G30
Toronto Sleep Institute
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-488-6980
Fax: 416-488-3998
Address: 377 Church St., Suite G06
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-554-5004
Fax: 905-554-7150
Address: 611 Holly Avenue
Suite 205
Milton Ontario L9T 0K4
Phone: 905-636-9772
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3024 Hurontario Street
Suite 208
Mississauga Ontario L5A 2H1
Phone: 905-566-1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Suite 204
Niagara Snoring and Sleep Clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 2G5
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: 1-888-905-6992
Address: 264 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y6
Phone: 705-254-3312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 790 Bay St. Suite 800
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Effie Fanaras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fanaras (CPSO#: 82608 )
Business Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 837-8181
Business Address: Suite G06
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 554-5004

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite G30
Toronto Sleep Institute
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-488-6980
Fax: 416-488-3998
Address: 377 Church St., Suite G06
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-554-5004
Fax: 905-554-7150
Address: 611 Holly Avenue
Suite 205
Milton Ontario L9T 0K4
Phone: 905-636-9772
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3024 Hurontario Street
Suite 208
Mississauga Ontario L5A 2H1
Phone: 905-566-1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Suite 204
Niagara Snoring and Sleep Clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 2G5
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: 1-888-905-6992
Address: 264 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y6
Phone: 705-254-3312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 790 Bay St. Suite 800
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Effie Fanaras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fanaras (CPSO#: 82608 )
Business Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 837-8181
Business Address: Suite G06
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 554-5004

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EFFIE FANARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANARAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EFFIE FANARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANARAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005