THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:23:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-037
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonal Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi (CPSO#: 82609 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
Unit T2-037 2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 4617

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-037
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonal Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi (CPSO#: 82609 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
Unit T2-037 2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 4617

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONAL GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONAL GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005